Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Loyola y Vergara, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1609BornIca, Peru
163727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
15 Jul 166959.7AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
Sep 167161.9Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
Nov 167768.0DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Loyola y Vergara:
Bishop Francisco de Loyola y Vergara O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015