Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio de Cimbrón, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597²BornAntol, Spain
May 1623³26.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
23 Jun 165356.5AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
9 Aug 165457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
8 Oct 165659.8InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
19 Sep 166164.7DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio de Cimbrón:
Bishop Dionisio de Cimbrón O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 184, Number 1,147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013