Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Romano y Govea (Vitoria)

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538²BornValladolid, Spain
13 Jan 157840.0AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
2 Dec 157840.9InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
12 Apr 160668.3DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Romano y Govea (Vitoria):
Bishop Diego de Romano y Govea (Vitoria) (died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,823
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 89, Number 549
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 4 Dec 2013