Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaas de Haudion

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
4 May 163943.3SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
16 Sep 164145.7ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
26 Jan 164246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
26 Sep 164953.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaas de Haudion
Bishop Nicolaas de Haudion (born 1596, died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast