Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Maximilien Villain

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹BornGand
1 Mar 159728.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Dec 159728.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 161445.9SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
2 Dec 161546.9ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
13 Mar 161647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
26 Sep 164576.7DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacob Maximilien Villain:
Bishop Jacob Maximilien Villain (born 1569, died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015