Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Ottemberg

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹BornNimegue
24 Nov 161055.8AppointedBishop of Arras, France
30 Jan 161156.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
23 May 162671.3DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann Ottemberg:
Bishop Hermann Ottemberg (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 49, Number 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015