Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Vetta

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1805Born
31 May 182823.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 184843.6SelectedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
20 Apr 184943.9ConfirmedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
10 Jun 184944.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
10 Feb 187367.7DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Vetta
Bishop Luigi Vetta (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcquaviva Collecroce
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast