Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Acisclo de Vera y Delgado

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1761Born
20 Jul 180139.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Jul 180139.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
18 Oct 180139.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
15 Mar 181553.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cádiz, Spain
22 Jul 181856.6DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Acisclo de Vera y Delgado
Archbishop Juan Acisclo de Vera y Delgado (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva del Ariscal

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 200, and Page 230
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 120, Number 636

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast