Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vento

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1849Born
7 Jun 187324.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189748.2AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
25 Apr 189748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
29 Sep 191061.6DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vento
Bishop Francesco Vento (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017