Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Asdrubale Termini

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1653Born
30 May 169541.6AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
2 Jun 169541.6Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 Jun 172268.6DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Asdrubale Termini
Bishop Asdrubale Termini (born , died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast