Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Godefroid de Berlo de Franc-Douaire

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1701BornFrank Denaire
21 Mar 173331.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Apr 173432.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 174038.6SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
5 Dec 174038.9ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
9 Apr 174139.2Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
16 Apr 174139.3InstalledBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
19 Jan 177169.0DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Paul Godefroid de Berlo de Franc-Douaire:
Bishop Paul Godefroid de Berlo de Franc-Douaire (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015