Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philibert François (Filiberto) Milliet de Faverges

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1564Born
4 Apr 159025.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
4 Apr 159025.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
6 May 159126.4SucceededBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
17 Dec 161854.0AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
17 Nov 162460.0DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Philibert François (Filiberto) Milliet de Faverges
Archbishop Philibert François (Filiberto) Milliet de Faverges (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaverges
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238, and Page 210
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast