Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Cuchot d’Herbain

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1727BornStrasbourg
20 Dec 174922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Strasbourg, France
18 Dec 175124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
30 Mar 177850.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
30 Mar 177850.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
31 May 177850.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
24 Jul 179466.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
31 Oct 180174.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Cuchot d’Herbain:
Bishop Jean-Marie Cuchot d’Herbain (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015