Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Ugolini

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1777BornMonte Colombo
21 Mar 180124.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 181942.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
24 Aug 181942.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amorium
24 May 182447.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fossombrone, Italy
16 Nov 185073.7DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ugolini
Archbishop Luigi Ugolini (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 71, and Page 197
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016