Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Barber Tyler

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1806BornDerby, MD
1821¹14.6Converted
3 Jun 182923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
28 Nov 184337.5AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
17 Mar 184437.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
14 Apr 184437.9InstalledBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
18 Jun 184943.0DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Barber Tyler:
Bishop William Barber Tyler (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013