Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Torija de la Fuente

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1927Born
7 Jun 195225.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 196942.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santander, Spain
4 Nov 196942.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
14 Dec 196942.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona
30 Sep 197649.5AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
30 Sep 197649.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
4 Feb 198052.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain
20 Mar 200376.0RetiredBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain
2 Mar 201991.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Torija de la Fuente
Bishop Rafael Torija de la Fuente (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Real

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoez
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceCiudad Real, Diocese of Ciudad Real

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: CB, 2 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 518
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast