Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Tola

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1758BornBosa
23 Feb 178224.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 182364.9SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
10 Mar 182365.0ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
29 Jun 182365.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
23 Feb 184385.0DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Tola
Bishop Francesco Maria Tola (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1840
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 115
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016