Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Tommaso Arnosio

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1774BornCarignano
10 Jun 179722.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 182247.4SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
27 Sep 182248.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
8 Dec 182248.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
18 Aug 182854.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Tommaso Arnosio
Archbishop Carlo Tommaso Arnosio (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 381
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016