Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Raimondo Tore

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1781³BornTanaro
10 Nov 182745.8SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
28 Jan 182846.1ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
25 May 182846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
20 Jul 183755.5SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
2 Oct 183755.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
9 Mar 184058.2DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Raimondo Tore
Archbishop Antonio Raimondo Tore (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 126, and Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016