Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Thoresby

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1347AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
23 Sep 1347Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
4 Sep 1349AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 1352AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 1373DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Thoresby:
Archbishop John Thoresby (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233, and Page 529
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 336
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 107, and Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013