Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Saint-Leger

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1349AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
2 May 1350Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
24 Aug 1352DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Saint-Leger
Bishop William Saint-Leger (died ) Bishop of Meath

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast