Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Brian

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Sep 1349AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
26 Sep 1350Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
22 Oct 1352AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
10 Dec 1361DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Reginald Brian:
Bishop Reginald Brian (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 336
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 77
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 294
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013