Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Strozzi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹Born
4 May 162643.3AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
1 Jun 162643.4Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
8 Mar 163249.1AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
28 Aug 164865.6DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Strozzi
Bishop Alessandro Strozzi (born 1583, died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopQuirinal (Montecavallo) Palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSan Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, San Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 83
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 32
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 28 Nov 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast