Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Hatfield

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
8 May 1345SelectedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
7 Aug 1345Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
8 May 1381DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Hatfield:
Bishop Thomas Hatfield (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 231
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013