Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Aungerville

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Oct 1333AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 1333Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 1345DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Aungerville:
Bishop Richard Aungerville (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015