Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Cittadella

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1740BornVico
22 Sep 17422.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 177232.5SelectedBishop of Nebbio, France
15 Mar 177332.9ConfirmedBishop of Nebbio, France
30 May 177333.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
26 Feb 177534.8SelectedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
22 Apr 177535.0ResignedBishop of Nebbio, France
29 May 177535.1ConfirmedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
30 Sep 178141.4DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

MicroData Summary for François Cittadella:
Bishop François Cittadella (born , died ) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 276, and Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015