Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Crescenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1591AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
4 Dec 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
13 Aug 1630DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Crescenzi:
Bishop Marcello Crescenzi (died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 121
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 31, Number 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013