Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Francesco Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1594Born
29 Apr 162430.2AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
19 May 162430.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
14 Mar 165561.0DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco Costa
Bishop Pietro Francesco Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 84, Number 502
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast