Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottaviano Cardinal Raggi

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1592BornGenoa
16 Dec 164149.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Feb 164249.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
12 Jan 164350.0AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
1 Feb 164350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
31 Dec 164351.0DiedBishop of Aleria, France

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Raggi:
Cardinal Ottaviano Raggi (born , died ) Bishop of Aleria

  • a bishop for .9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,835
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013