Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Spalatin

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1716Born
26 Dec 173923.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177558.2AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
19 Mar 177558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
25 Jun 178164.5AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
10 Feb 179881.1DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Simon Spalatin
Bishop Simon Spalatin (born , died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArba

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109, and Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast