Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Dominique Altei

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1737BornZadar
23 Sep 176023.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 180264.9SelectedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
20 Dec 180265.4ConfirmedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
27 Mar 180365.6Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
1808¹70.4DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Dominique Altei:
Bishop Jean Dominique Altei (born ) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015