Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maximilian Joseph Gottfried Cardinal Sommerau Beeckh

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1769³BornVienna, Austria
3 Sep 179727.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Sep 179727.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183666.9SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
19 May 183767.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
18 Jun 183767.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
30 Sep 185080.7Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 185383.2DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Joseph Gottfried Sommerau Beeckh (VIAF: 76753401)
Maximilian Joseph Gottfried Cardinal Sommerau Beeckh (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 17
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016