Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Alphonsus Sheehan

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1845BornBantry
2 Aug 186823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
15 Jan 189246.5AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
31 Jan 189246.6Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
14 Oct 191570.3DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Richard Alphonsus Sheehan
Bishop Richard Alphonsus Sheehan (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 596
  • op/c2+: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016