Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Gómez de Liñán de la Borda

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1729BornCartagena
27 Jun 179666.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
Sep 1796³66.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
30 Sep 180575.9DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Gómez de Liñán de la Borda
Bishop Jerónimo Gómez de Liñán de la Borda (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016