Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop César Argelli (de Paltronibus)

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornBologna
6 May 164773.3AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
12 May 164773.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
30 Jul 164874.5DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for César Argelli (de Paltronibus):
Archbishop César Argelli (de Paltronibus) (died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 676
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015