Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Gómez Calleja

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1720AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
16 Nov 1721Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Nov 1725AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
9 Sep 1728ResignedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
20 Sep 1728AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
1729DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Gómez Calleja:
Bishop Juan Francisco Gómez Calleja Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 145, and Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 320
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 40, Number 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013