Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sellent

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1670³Born
2 Mar 171241.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy
2 Mar 171241.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
30 Jul 171343.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
Jul 1737³66.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sellent
Bishop Antonio Sellent (born , died Jul 1737) Auxiliary Bishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopSanta Maria alla Sapienza, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 19
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast