Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Alessandro Francesco Rovèro di Cortanze, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bernardino Ignazio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1685³BornAsti
29 Jun 171227.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jul 171227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Aug 173045.3SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
2 Oct 173045.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
27 Dec 173045.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
18 Sep 174156.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
26 Oct 174762.5DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Alessandro Francesco Rovèro di Cortanze:
Archbishop Pietro Alessandro Francesco Rovèro di Cortanze O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314, and Page 422
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,040
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015