Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Maria Selitti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1807Born
5 Jun 183022.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 184942.0SelectedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
5 Nov 184942.2ConfirmedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
16 Dec 184942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
3 Aug 188173.9ResignedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
26 Apr 189991.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Maria Selitti
Bishop Ignazio Maria Selitti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce
Ordained BishopSan Carlo all’arena, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 379
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 62
  • ob.loc: AT, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast