Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Scappi

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹BornBologna
12 Feb 161847.1AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
18 Feb 161847.1Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
15 Apr 162150.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
17 May 162756.3AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
28 Jun 162857.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
20 Jun 165079.4DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Scappi (VIAF: 220570562)
Bishop Alessandro Scappi (born 1571, died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131, and Page 281
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 63, Number 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 1
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016