Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mohr von Zernetz

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornMals
1605¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 162750.7AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
24 Oct 162750.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
6 Aug 163558.6DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mohr von Zernetz:
Bishop Joseph Mohr von Zernetz (died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 170
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013