Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelus Maria Cittadini, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornFaenza
15 Jul 162442.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
15 Jul 162442.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
21 Jul 162442.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
9 Jul 162745.5SucceededArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
10 Dec 162947.9DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelus Maria Cittadini:
Archbishop Angelus Maria Cittadini O. Cart. (born 1582, died ) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251, and Page 253
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 85, Number 507
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015