Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Savio

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1811Born
22 Feb 183422.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186755.7AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
26 May 186755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
1 Jul 188170.0DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Savio (VIAF: 8154611)
Bishop Carlo Savio (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017