Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ippolito Cardinal de’ Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Biagio dell’Anello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1531Born
Sep 1560³28.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
Sep 1560³28.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 156028.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pavia, Italy
4 Sep 156028.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
4 Sep 156432.8SucceededBishop of Pavia, Italy
18 Dec 158554.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158654.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
27 Apr 158755.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Biagio dell’Anello
28 Apr 159159.4DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito de’ Rossi (VIAF: 7277044)
Ippolito Cardinal de’ Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Secondo
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Biagio dell’Anello, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 62*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast