Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe di Ceva

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
12 May 161434.3AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
20 May 161434.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
21 Oct 163353.8DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe di Ceva
Bishop Giuseppe di Ceva (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCunei

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 56, Number 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast