Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Della Ciaia

Deceased

Bishop of Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
1610²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 161632.1AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
28 Feb 161632.1Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
Nov 1616³32.8DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Della Ciaia
Bishop Angelo Della Ciaia (born 1584, died Nov 1616) Bishop of Teano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAnnonciata, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 6.8 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 331
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 35
  • b/c2+: CB, 22 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017