Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Sanguigni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1809Born
23 Jan 186353.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
30 Mar 187464.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
15 Jun 187464.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
23 Aug 187465.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
19 Sep 187970.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 187970.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
27 Feb 188070.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
20 Nov 188273.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Domenico Sanguigni
Domenico Cardinal Sanguigni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerracina, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Andrea al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 537, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 44
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 77, and Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast