Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Salvatore

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1824Born
23 Dec 184824.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187247.4AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
26 May 187247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
7 Sep 189974.7DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Salvatore
Bishop Vincenzo Salvatore (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarifece, Diocese of Lacedonia
Ordained BishopSanta Francesca Romana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 292
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,741
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast