Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslao Sangüesa y Guía

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1841BornMadrid
24 Sep 186423.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 190058.6AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
5 Aug 190058.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
1921¹79.3RetiredBishop of Cuenca, Spain
8 Feb 192280.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenceslao Sangüesa y Guía:
Bishop Wenceslao Sangüesa y Guía (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013