Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges M. Saad Abi Younes, O.L.M.

Bishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1948 BornHammana, Lebanon
17 Jan 197021.7ProfessedMember of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
3 Jul 197729.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
22 Feb 200354.8AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)
26 Apr 200355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Georges M. Saad Abi Younes:
Bishop Georges M. Saad Abi Younes O.L.M. (born ) Bishop of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Nuestra Señora de los Mártires del Libano en México (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013